US HB2627 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Investment Company Act of 1940 to prohibit limitations on closed-end companies investing in private funds, and for other purposes.
Title
Increasing Investor Opportunities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
Rep. Wiley Nickel [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 252. |
2023-12-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-312. |
2023-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 11. |
2023-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-04-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2799 (Related) 2024-03-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB5060 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5060 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.