US HB2620 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-36. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-36. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the United States Cotton Futures Act to exclude certain cotton futures contracts from coverage under such Act. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the United States Cotton Futures Act to exclude cotton future contracts involving cotton that is grown outside of the United States and tendered for delivery from coverage under the Act, including the requirement that the cotton be classified by the Department of Agriculture.
Title
To amend the United States Cotton Futures Act to exclude certain cotton futures contracts from coverage under such Act.
Sponsors
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-36. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4979) |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2015-06-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4563) |
2015-06-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2620. |
2015-06-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4563-4564) |
2015-06-23 | House | Mr. Scott, Austin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 129. |
2015-06-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 114-174. |
2015-06-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-06-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2015-06-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1655 (Related) 2015-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.