US HB2611 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-117. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-117. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act (Sec. 2) This bill adjusts the boundary of the Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site in Arkansas to include the 7 residences on South Park Street in Little Rock, which consist of 1.47 acres of specified land. The Department of the Interior may enter into separate cooperative agreements with the owners of such residences to mark, interpret, improve, restore, and provide technical assistance for the preservation and interpretation of their properties. Such an agreement must include a provision specifying that no changes or alterations shall be made to the exterior of the properties except by mutual agreement.
Title
Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 485 (Y: 390 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-117. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269) |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 485). (text: CR H7251) |
2017-09-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7287) |
2017-09-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2611. |
2017-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7251-7253) |
2017-09-12 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-09-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 209. |
2017-09-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-290. |
2017-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1202 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Arkansas
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history