US HB2610 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Expands activities to address mail, telephone, and internet fraud, particularly such scams targeting older adults, Indian tribes, or tribal members. The bill establishes a Senior Scams Prevention Advisory Group, which must create model educational materials to educate employees of retailers, financial-services companies, and wire-transfer companies on how to identify and prevent scams that affect older adults. Further, the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) must establish an advisory office in the Bureau of Consumer Protection to assist the FTC in monitoring scams targeting older adults, educating consumers, and receiving complaints. The FTC also must report not later than 30 days after enactment of this bill on scams targeting older adults and provide policy recommendations to prevent such scams, including scams related to future national emergencies. The FTC must make available on its website information related to scams targeting older adults and coordinate with media outlets and law enforcement to disseminate such information. Additionally, the FTC must report on, and make publicly available, information about unfair or deceptive acts or practices targeting Indian tribes or tribal members, including efforts to prevent such practices and pursue those who use them. Finally, the FTC must report on efforts to collaborate with state attorneys general to prevent, publicize, and penalize fraud and scams against individuals, including the roles of relevant stakeholders, mechanisms for cooperation, and appropriate resource allocation.
Title
Fraud and Scam Reduction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7638-7639) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2713 Amendment SA 2713 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2713 Amendment SA 2713 proposed by Senator Braun for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S7638-7639; text: CR S7638-7639) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7638-7639) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5827-5829) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2610. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5827-5831) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 488. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-590. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Aging
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Marketing and advertising
Postal service
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Television and film
Aging
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Marketing and advertising
Postal service
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Television and film