US HB2592 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Honest Ads Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honest Ads Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
2019-05-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1356 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback