US HB2592 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies requirements, limitations, and protections regarding political advertising in traditional media to internet or digital political advertising. The bill sets forth special rules for disclosure statements for certain internet or digital ads. Each television or radio station, provider of cable or satellite television, or online platform must ensure that the political advertising it hosts is not directly or indirectly purchased by a foreign national. Online platforms must publish a record of requests to purchase political advertising.
Title
Honest Ads Act
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] |
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1356 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business records
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
News media and reporting
Political advertising
Subversive activities
Television and film
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Business records
Congressional oversight
Digital media
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal Election Commission (FEC)
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
News media and reporting
Political advertising
Subversive activities
Television and film
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2592/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2592/BILLS-116hr2592ih.pdf |