US HB2579 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 374.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 374.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the requirements applicable to locatable minerals on public domain lands, consistent with the principles of self-initiation of mining claims, and for other purposes.
Title
Hardrock Leasing and Reclamation Act of 2019 Materials Act of 1947 Surface Resources Act of 1955
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 374. |
2020-08-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-467. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 13. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-23 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2019-05-09 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Federal-Indian relations
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Intellectual property
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Lease and rental services
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Administrative remedies
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Federal-Indian relations
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Intellectual property
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Lease and rental services
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pollution liability
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection