US HB2530 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the general counsel of the Merit Systems Protection Board to temporarily act as a member of the board when dealing with matters related to the staying of certain personnel actions, and it authorizes a single member of the board to carry out certain board duties in the event of a lack of quorum.
Title
Interim Stay Authority To Protect Whistleblowers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Lawyers and legal services
Merit Systems Protection Board
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Lawyers and legal services
Merit Systems Protection Board
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2530/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2530/BILLS-116hr2530ih.pdf |