US HB2524 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the multi-state insurance plan program. (The multi-state plan program requires the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to contract with insurance issuers to provide a qualified health plan through the health insurance exchanges in multiple states.) The OPM must report about the process and timeline for ending the program within 60 days.
Title
RIP MSP Act Repeal Insurance Plans of the Multi-State Program Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1313 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1378 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 190.
SB1378 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 190.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Public contracts and procurement
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2524/BILLS-116hr2524ih.pdf |