US SB1378 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 190.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 190.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the multi-state insurance plan program. (The multi-state plan program requires the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to contract with insurance issuers to provide a qualified health plan through the health insurance exchanges in multiple states.) The OPM must report about the process and timeline for ending the program within 60 days.
Title
RIP MSP Act Repeal Insurance Plans of the Multi-State Program Act Repeal Insurance Plans of the Multi-State Program Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 190. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-86. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2524 (Related) 2019-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1313 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1313 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Appropriations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Public contracts and procurement
Appropriations
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Employee benefits and pensions
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Public contracts and procurement