US HB2468 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-164.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 118-164.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Interior to convey to the State of Utah certain Federal land under the administrative jurisdiction of the Bureau of Land Management within the boundaries of Camp Williams, Utah, and for other purposes.
Title
Mountain View Corridor Completion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Sen. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Celeste Maloy [R-UT] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 118-164. |
2024-12-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2024-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2024-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7087) |
2024-09-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 528. |
2024-09-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-09-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5722-5723) |
2024-09-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2468. |
2024-09-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5722-5723) |
2024-09-24 | House | Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 564. |
2024-09-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-668. |
2024-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2023-07-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3036 (Related) 2024-09-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 515.