US HB2462 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E684)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E684)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SAFE Bridges Act of 2017 Strengthen And Fortify Existing Bridges Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Transportation to establish a program to assist states to rehabilitate or replace bridges found to be structurally deficient. States shall use apportioned program funds for projects to rehabilitate and replace such bridges. The federal share of project costs is 100%. Prevailing rate of wage requirements for construction of federal-aid highways projects shall apply to such projects.
Title
SAFE Bridges Act of 2017 Strengthen And Fortify Existing Bridges Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E684) |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB846 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2462/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2462/BILLS-115hr2462ih.pdf |