US HB2453 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide grants to States that do not suspend, revoke, or refuse to renew a driver's license of a person or refuse to renew a registration of a motor vehicle for failure to pay a civil or criminal fine or fee, and for other purposes.
Title
Driving for Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB998 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 260.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2453/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2453/BILLS-117hr2453ih.pdf |