US SB998 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 260.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide grants to States that do not suspend, revoke, or refuse to renew a driver's license of a person or refuse to renew a registration of a motor vehicle for failure to pay a civil or criminal fine or fee, and for other purposes.
Title
Driving for Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 260. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2453 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended).