US HB2448 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ending Unemployment Payments to Jobless Millionaires Act of 2013 - Prohibits federal funds from being used to make payments of unemployment compensation (including such compensation under the Federal-State Extended Compensation Act of 1970 and the emergency unemployment compensation program under the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008) to an individual whose resources in the preceding year were at least $1 million. Requires an individual's resources to be determined in the same manner as a subsidy eligible individual's resources are determined under the alternative resource standard of the Social Security Act.
Title
Ending Unemployment Payments to Jobless Millionaires Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB18 (Related) 2013-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2097 (Related) 2014-03-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 318.
SB2097 (Related) 2014-03-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 318.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2448/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2448/BILLS-113hr2448ih.pdf |