US HB2443 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Homeland Security Classified Facility Inventory Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) maintain an inventory of DHS facilities that DHS certifies to house classified infrastructure or systems at the secret level and above; (2) update such inventory on a regular basis; and (3) share part or all of such inventory with DHS personnel who have been granted the appropriate security clearance, non-federal governmental personnel who have been granted a Top Secret security clearance, and other personnel as deemed appropriate by DHS. The inventory may include the location, attributes, operating entities, and date of establishment of such facilities.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Classified Facility Inventory Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7246) |
2017-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2443. |
2017-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7246-7247) |
2017-09-12 | House | Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Department of Homeland Security
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information