US HB2443 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safeguarding Children Harmed by Obamacare's Onerous Levies Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from the definition of "applicable large employer" for purposes of the employer mandate to provide health care coverage for employees: (1) any elementary or secondary school, (2) any for-profit school which would be an elementary or secondary school if it were nonprofit, (3) any state or local educational agency, and (4) any institution of higher education (other than institutions outside of the United States).
Title
Safeguarding Children Harmed by Obamacare's Onerous Levies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4775 (Related) 2014-05-30 - Referred to House Education and the Workforce
SB2462 (Related) 2014-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2462 (Related) 2014-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2443/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2443/BILLS-113hr2443ih.pdf |