US HB2382 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 233-69)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that the U.S. Postal Service annually prepay future retirement health benefits.
Title
USPS Fairness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 37 (Y: 309 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 309 - 106 (Roll no. 37). (text: CR H811) |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H834-835) |
2020-02-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2382. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H811-815) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-04 | House | Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mr. DeFazio. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-04-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2965 (Same As) 2019-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
U.S. Postal Service
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
U.S. Postal Service