US HB2340 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to notify Congress following a suicide or attempted suicide of a veteran that occurs in a VA facility. Specifically, the VA must provide the name and location of the facility and also specified information regarding the veteran who committed or attempted suicide. The VA is required to include in each notification (1) guidance to deter the sensationalism of suicide, (2) guidance for identifying warning signs exhibited by veterans at risk of suicide, and (3) information on the resources available from the VA to veterans at risk of suicide.
Title
FIGHT Veteran Suicides Act Fostering Intergovernmental Health Transparency in Veteran Suicides Act
Sponsors
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4041) |
2019-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2340. |
2019-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4041-4042) |
2019-05-21 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 53. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-77. |
2019-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Veterans' medical care