US HB2332 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit consumer reporting agencies from furnishing a consumer report containing any adverse item of information about a consumer if such consumer is a victim of trafficking, and for other purposes.
Title
Debt Bondage Repair Act
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2021-06-15 | House | Pursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 473, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 293; H.R. 587; H.R. 610, as amended; H.R. 1144, as amended; H.R. 1703, as amended; H.R. 1921; H.R. 2008; H.R. 2332, as amended; H.R. 2545; and H.R. 3642, as amended. (consideration: CR H2792-2799; text: CR H2797) |
2021-06-15 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 473, proceedings on H.R. 2332 are considered vacated. |
2021-06-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2332. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2785-2787; text: CR H2785) |
2021-06-15 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR473 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2716)
SB2040 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
SB2040 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.