US HB2327 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to continue assisting civil society organizations in Burma (Myanmar) working to release political prisoners and prisoners of conscience. Such assistance may include support for (1) documenting human rights violations against such prisoners, (2) raising awareness of prisoner issues, and (3) helping former prisoners resume a normal life.
Title
Burma Political Prisoners Assistance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-09-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7877) |
2019-09-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2327. |
2019-09-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7877-7878) |
2019-09-24 | House | Mr. Levin (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2069 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Asia
Burma
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Health care costs and insurance
Human rights
International affairs
Legal fees and court costs
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Transportation costs
Burma
Child safety and welfare
Conflicts and wars
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Health care costs and insurance
Human rights
International affairs
Legal fees and court costs
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
Transportation costs