US HB226 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out a pilot program to promote and encourage collaboration between the Department of Veterans Affairs and nonprofit organizations and institutions of higher learning that provide administrative assistance to veterans.
Title
Veterans Collaboration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2024-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-06-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/226/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr226/BILLS-118hr226ih.pdf |