US HB2247 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides support for the restoration and protection of the Puget Sound, an estuary in the Pacific Ocean off the coast of Washington. Specifically, the bill establishes (1) a Puget Sound Recovery National Program Office within the Environmental Protection Agency; and (2) the Puget Sound Federal Leadership Task Force, which replaces the existing Puget Sound Federal Task Force. Finally, the bill establishes a State Advisory Committee.
Title
PUGET SOS Act Promoting United Government Efforts to Save Our Sound Act
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H788-791) |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2247. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H788-796) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 233. |
2019-11-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-290. |
2019-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Pacific Ocean
Puget Sound
Scientific communication
Washington State
Water quality
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Pacific Ocean
Puget Sound
Scientific communication
Washington State
Water quality