US HB2229 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of State to waive passport fees for an individual operating under a contract, grant, or cooperative agreement with the U.S. government, including a volunteer, to travel abroad within the first seven days after a natural disaster to aid a foreign country suffering from the natural disaster. The Department of State shall report to Congress on the number of fee waivers for the issuance of passports to first responders.
Title
First Responders Passport Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-09-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7874) |
2019-09-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2229. |
2019-09-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7874-7875) |
2019-09-24 | House | Mr. Levin (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Natural disasters
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Disaster relief and insurance
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Natural disasters
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
User charges and fees
Visas and passports