US HB2213 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Anti-Border Corruption Reauthorization Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Anti-Border Corruption Act of 2010 to expand the authority of the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to waive the administration of polygraph examinations to civilian and military applicants for law enforcement positions in the CBP. This expanded waiver authority terminates five years after the enactment of this bill. (Sec. 3) An individual who receives such a waiver is not exempt from other hiring requirements relating to suitability for employment and eligibility to hold a national security designated position. Any individual who receives a waiver and holds a current Tier 4 (High Risk Public Trust) background investigation shall be subject to a Tier 5 (Critical Sensitive and Special Sensitive National Security) background investigation. The CBP may administer a polygraph examination to an applicant or employee who receives a waiver if information is discovered prior to the completion of a background investigation that results in a determination that a polygraph examination is necessary to make a final determination regarding suitability for employment or continued employment. The CBP shall provide Congress information on the number of waivers requested, granted, and denied, and the reasons for any such denial, and the final outcome of the application for employment at issue. Such information shall also include the number of instances a polygraph examination was administered, the result of any such examination, and the final outcome of the application for employment at issue.
Title
Anti-Border Corruption Reauthorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - On agreeing to the Lujan Grisham, M. amendment (A002) H.Amdt.127 RC# 293 (Y: 179 N: 238 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - On passage RC# 294 (Y: 282 N: 137 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - On passage RC# 294 (Y: 282 N: 137 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-07 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 282 - 137 (Roll no. 294). (text: CR H4676-4677) |
2017-06-07 | House | H.Amdt.127 On agreeing to the Lujan Grisham, M. amendment (A002) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 179 - 238 (Roll no. 293). |
2017-06-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4687-4688) |
2017-06-07 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of the debate on the Lujan Grisham amendment, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McCaul requested the Yeas and Nays and pursuant to the order of the House of June 7, 2017 the Chair postponed further proceedings on the adoption of the Lujan Grisham amendment until a time to be announced. |
2017-06-07 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-06-07 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 374, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lujan Grisham (NM) amendment. |
2017-06-07 | House | H.Amdt.127 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Lujan Grisham, M.. (consideration: CR H4683-4684; text: CR H4683) |
2017-06-07 | House | ORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. McCaul asked unanimous consent that the question of adopting the amendment to H.R. 2213 may be subject to postponement as though under clause 8 of rule 20. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2213. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2213 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. |
2017-06-07 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 374. (consideration: CR H4676-4684) |
2017-06-07 | House | Rule H. Res. 374 passed House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 374 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2213 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order. |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 74. |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-121. |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB595 (Related) 2017-07-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 179.
HR374 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4760 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR954 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3478 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6415 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HR374 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4760 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR954 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3478 (Related) 2018-09-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6415 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Law enforcement officers
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Law enforcement officers
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation