US HB2196 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Independence at Home Medical Practice Demonstration Improvement Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to increase from a three-year to a five-year period the length of an agreement with an independence at home medical practice under the Medicare Independence at Home Medical Practice Demonstration Program.
Title
Medicare Independence at Home Medical Practice Demonstration Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Same As) 2015-07-30 - Became Public Law No: 114-39. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2196/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2196/BILLS-114hr2196ih.pdf |