US HB2169 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Fusion Centers' Access to Information Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Department of Homeland Security State, Local, and Regional Fusion Center Initiative to: (1) conduct outreach to state, local, and regional fusion centers to identify any gaps in information sharing and consult with other federal agencies to develop methods to address such gaps; and (2) identify federal databases and datasets that are appropriate to address any such gaps, for inclusion in the information sharing environment and coordinate with the appropriate federal agency to deploy or access such databases and datasets. A fusion center serves as a focal point within the state and local environment for the receipt, analysis, gathering, and sharing of threat-related information between the federal government and state, local, tribal, territorial, and private sector partners.
Title
Improving Fusion Centers' Access to Information Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4269) |
2017-05-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2169. |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4269-4271) |
2017-05-17 | House | Mr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73. |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-120. |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Emergency management
Government information and archives
Homeland security
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Terrorism
Government information and archives
Homeland security
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Terrorism