US HB2153 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Science, Space, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Science, Space, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To invest in basic scientific research and support technology innovation for the economic and national security of the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Securing American Leadership in Science and Technology Act of 2021 Advanced Recycling Research and Development Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] |
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Jacob Laturner [R-KS] | Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] |
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB954 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB4661 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB4662 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB4822 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB4661 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB4662 (Related) 2021-07-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB4822 (Related) 2021-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2153/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2153/BILLS-117hr2153ih.pdf |