US HB2127 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Securing Expedited Screening Act (Sec. 3) The Transportation Security Administration (TSA) of the Department of Homeland Security shall, within 180 days after enactment of this Act, limit access to expedited airport security screening at airport security checkpoints to only a passenger who: voluntarily submits biographic and biometric information for a security risk assessment and has an approved PreCheck program application; is traveling as air transportation security or a member of the Armed Forces, including any accompanying family member; is a member of a population designated by the TSA as known and low-risk and who may be issued a unique, known traveler number; or is 75 years or older, or 12 years or younger and traveling with a parent or guardian participating in the PreCheck program. The TSA may extend for one year implementation of the requirement for passengers who have been designated frequent fliers. The TSA may provide access to expedited airport security screening to additional passengers through an alternate method upon submission to Congress of an independent assessment of its security effectiveness. (Sec. 4) The TSA shall report annually to Congress certain information on passengers provided expedited security screening.
Title
Securing Expedited Screening Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2015-07-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-07-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5502-5503) |
2015-07-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2127. |
2015-07-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5502-5504) |
2015-07-27 | House | Mr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-07-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 166. |
2015-07-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-220. |
2015-06-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-06-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security. |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2015-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Congressional oversight
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security