US HB209 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the permitting process for mining on Federal land, and for other purposes.
Title
Permitting for Mining Needs Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] |
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] |
Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] |
Rep. Monica De La Cruz [R-TX] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. James Moylan [R-GU] |
Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. John Duarte [R-CA] | Rep. Anna Luna [R-FL] |
Rep. Wesley Hunt [R-TX] | Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
HB1335 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 18.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2623 (Related) 2023-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB1281 (Related) 2023-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB2925 (Related) 2024-05-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1456 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB1335 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 18.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2623 (Related) 2023-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB1281 (Related) 2023-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB2925 (Related) 2024-05-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1456 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/209/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr209/BILLS-118hr209ih.pdf |