US HB2056 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Microloan Modernization Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Small Business Act, with respect to the Small Business Administration (SBA) Microloan Program (assisting low-income individuals to start and operate a small business), to increase from $5 million to $6 million the total amount of loans outstanding and committed to any particular intermediary (excluding outstanding grants) from the SBA business loan and investment fund for the remaining years of the intermediary's participation in the program. (Sec. 4) SBA-designated microloan intermediary lenders may expend up to 50% (currently, 25%) of the intensive marketing, management, and technical assistance grant funds they receive from the SBA to provide information and technical assistance to small business concerns that are their prospective borrowers. (Sec. 5) The SBA shall: compare the operations of a representative sample of eligible intermediaries that participate in the microloan program and of eligible intermediaries that do not, study the reasons why the latter do not participate, recommend how to encourage increased participation by intermediaries in the microloan program, and recommend how to decrease the associated costs for intermediary participation. (Sec. 6) The Government Accountability Office shall evaluate: SBA oversight of the microloan program, including oversight of participating intermediaries; and the specific processes the SBA uses to ensure program compliance by participating intermediaries and overall microloan program performance.
Title
Microloan Modernization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2017-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6180) |
2017-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2056. |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6179-6181) |
2017-07-24 | House | Mr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-07-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 150. |
2017-07-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-214. |
2017-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2017-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB526 (Same As) 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-452.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
SB2873 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5975 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
SB2873 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5975 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Small business
Congressional oversight
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Small business