US HB2051 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate methamphetamine as an emerging threat, and for other purposes.
Title
Methamphetamine Response Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2021-07-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB854 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Became Public Law No: 117-99.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2051/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2051/BILLS-117hr2051ih.pdf |