US SB854 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Became Public Law No: 117-99.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Became Public Law No: 117-99.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate methamphetamine as an emerging threat, and for other purposes.
Title
Methamphetamine Response Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-99. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-02-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1156) |
2022-02-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 854. |
2022-02-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1156-1158) |
2022-02-28 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-12-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-12-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S9125) |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9125) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1648) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2051 (Same As) 2021-07-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.