US HB2034 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced Composites Development Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretaries of Transportation (DOT), Energy (DOE), Defense (DOD), and Homeland Security (DHS), to carry out a program to improve the nation's transportation infrastructure, advance the technologies used to produce alternative energy, enhance our military security, and develop new disaster mitigation systems by making grants to consortia for the establishment and operation of Advanced Composites Development Centers. Instructs the Secretaries to work with stakeholders to identify problems that can be solved over a period of five years through the development of an advanced composite material. Requires such Centers, by working with the private sector, to strive to produce new composite materials, including related manufacturing processes or applications, that: (1) are lighter, stronger, and more durable than existing materials; (2) have lower life-cycle costs or lower overall environmental impacts; and (3) have an immediate practical application.
Title
Advanced Composites Development Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2013-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2013-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies. |
2013-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Armed Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Disaster relief and insurance
Education programs funding
Energy research
Government information and archives
Higher education
Infrastructure development
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Transportation programs funding
Disaster relief and insurance
Education programs funding
Energy research
Government information and archives
Higher education
Infrastructure development
Materials
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2034/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2034/BILLS-113hr2034ih.pdf |