US HB1982 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 23, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Transportation to establish a program to provide grants to carry out activities to benefit pollinators on roadsides and highway rights-of-way, including the planting and seeding of native, locally appropriate grasses and wildflowers, including milkweed, and for other purposes.
Title
Monarch and Pollinator Highway Act of 2021 MPH Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB806 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1931 (Related) 2021-10-06 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-41.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1931 (Related) 2021-10-06 - By Senator Carper from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 117-41.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1982/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1982/BILLS-117hr1982ih.pdf |