US HB1931 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-14 - Star Print ordered on the reported bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-14 - Star Print ordered on the reported bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide competitive grants for the promotion of Japanese American confinement education as a means to understand the importance of democratic principles, use and abuse of power, and to raise awareness about the importance of cultural tolerance toward Japanese Americans, and for other purposes.
Title
Norman Y. Mineta Japanese American Confinement Education Act Japanese American Confinement Education Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-14 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the reported bill. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment. With written report No. 117-170. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3723-3724) |
2022-03-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1931. |
2022-03-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3723-3725) |
2022-03-15 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-03-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 199. |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-271. |
2021-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-17 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-05-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB988 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB4576 (Related) 2022-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB4576 (Related) 2022-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.