US HB1917 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes an entity seeking assistance under a hazard mitigation assistance program eligible to receive such assistance for certain projects already in progress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hazard Eligibility and Local Projects Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-03-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-24HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
2021-03-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2021-03-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1877 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback