US HB1911 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Special Envoy to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism Act of 2018 (Sec. 3) This bill amends the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to provide that the Special Envoy to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism shall have the rank of ambassador and be appointed by the President by and with the advice and consent of the Senate. The Special Envoy shall: (1) be a person of recognized distinction in the field of combating anti-Semitism, law enforcement, or religious freedom; (2) serve as the primary advisor to, and coordinate efforts across, the U.S. government relating to monitoring and combating anti-Semitism and anti-Semitic incitement in foreign countries; and (3) report directly to the Secretary of State.
Title
Special Envoy to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 398 (Y: 393 N: 2 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 2 (Roll no. 398). (text: CR 09/12/2018 H8150-8151) |
2018-09-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8184) |
2018-09-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1911. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8150-8153) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-10 | House | Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations Discharged. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-04-05 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E464-465) |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1292 (Same As) 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Federal officials
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Federal officials
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion