US HB1773 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarity for America's Small Contractors Act of 2017 This bill amends the Small Business Act to require the annual Small Business Administration (SBA) reports to the President and Congress analyzing the number and dollar amount of prime contracts awarded by federal agencies each fiscal year to specified kinds of small business concerns to include awards that were purchased by another entity after the initial contract was awarded. The concern would no longer be deemed to be a small business because of such purchase. The SBA must also report on awards to small businesses that were awarded using a procurement method other than a small business set-aside, preference, or full and open competition. The bill revises the range of the anticipated value of federal procurement contracts that must be reserved exclusively for small business concerns to between the micro-purchase threshold ($3,000) and the simplified acquisition threshold ($100,000). (Currently the range of the anticipated value must be between $2,500 and $100,000.) The bill specifies the principal duties of commercial market representatives, including to help prime contractors find small business concerns that are capable of performing subcontracts. This bill: (1) extends for three years the deadline after which a person serving as an SBA business opportunity specialist must have a Level I Federal Acquisition Certification in Contracting or the equivalent Department of Defense certification; and (2) declares that the exclusive duties of such a specialist who reports to the senior official appointed by the SBA with certain SBA loan responsibilities, including the procurement program for small business concerns owned and controlled by service-disabled veterans and the Historically Underutilized Business Zone (HUBZone) program, shall be to implement specified SBA loan programs and to complete other duties related to contracting programs.
Title
Clarity for America's Small Contractors Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1597 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB1640 (Related) 2017-03-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB1641 (Related) 2017-03-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB1693 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1640 (Related) 2017-03-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB1641 (Related) 2017-03-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB1693 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Women in business
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Women in business