US HB1597 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial Market Representatives Clarification Act This bill amends the Small Business Act to specify the principal duties of Commercial Market Representatives, government contracting staff stationed at area Small Business Administration (SBA) offices and reporting to specified senior SBA officers. Such duties shall include: helping prime federal government contractors to find small business concerns capable of performing subcontracts; counseling such contractors on their responsibility to maximize subcontracting opportunities for small business concerns; instructing such contractors on methods and tools to identify potential subcontractors that are small business concerns; assisting such constractors to increase awards to small business subcontractors through visits, training, and reviews of past performance; giving counseling on how a small business concern may promote its capacity to such contractors; and conducting periodic reviews of such contractors to assess compliance with required subcontracting plans regarding small business subcontractors.
Title
Commercial Market Representatives Clarification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Brat [R-VA] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1773 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Business education
Commerce
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration
Commerce
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Small Business Administration