US HB1640 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Small Business Act to ensure uniformity in procurement terminology, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Small Business Act to require each government contract for the purchase of goods and services that has an anticipated value greater than the micro-purchase threshold but not greater than the simplified acquisition threshold (currently, greater than $2,500 but not greater than $100,000) to be reserved exclusively for small business concerns unless the contracting officer is unable to obtain offers from 2 or more small business concerns that are competitive with market prices and are competitive with regard to the quality and delivery of the goods or services being purchased.
Title
To amend the Small Business Act to ensure uniformity in procurement terminology, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1773 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.