US HB1765 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (USACE) from finalizing, implementing, or enforcing the proposed rule titled Washington Channel, Fort McNair, Washington, DC; Restricted Area, published on December 29, 2020. The proposed rule establishes a permanent restricted area in the Washington Channel adjacent to Fort McNair in the District of Columbia. The bill also prohibits the USACE from implementing any other rule that restricts public access to the Washington Channel in the District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Washington Channel Public Access Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 27.
2021-05-28HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-44.
2021-03-24HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-03-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-24HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2021-03-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2021-03-10HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E221)
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback