US HB1708 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts the boundary of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area in California as depicted on a specified map to include the Rim of the Valley Unit. The Rim of the Valley Unit, and any lands or interests acquired by the United States and located within its boundaries, shall be administered as part of the recreation area. The Department of the Interior may acquire only through exchange, donation, or purchase from a willing seller any nonfederal land within the boundaries of the Rim of the Valley Unit.
Title
Rim of the Valley Corridor Preservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309. |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-386. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 13. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB774 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 380.
HB2546 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2546 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.