US SB774 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts the boundary of the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area in California as depicted on a specified map to include the Rim of the Valley Unit. The Rim of the Valley Unit, and any lands or interests acquired by the United States and located within its boundaries, shall be administered as part of the recreation area. The Department of the Interior may acquire only through exchange, donation, or purchase from a willing seller any nonfederal land within the boundaries of the Rim of the Valley Unit.
Title
Rim of the Valley Corridor Preservation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 380. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1849) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1708 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.