US HB1667 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 137-30)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Became Public Law No: 117-105. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes grants and requires other activities to improve mental and behavioral health among health care providers. Specifically, the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must award grants to hospitals, medical professional associations, and other health care entities for programs to promote mental health and resiliency among health care providers. In addition, HHS may award grants for relevant mental and behavioral health training for health care students, residents, or professionals. Additionally, HHS must conduct a campaign to (1) encourage health care providers to seek support and treatment for mental and behavioral health concerns, and (2) disseminate best practices to prevent suicide and improve mental health and resiliency among health care providers. HHS must also study and develop policy recommendations on improving mental and behavioral health among health care providers, removing barriers to accessing care and treatment, and identifying strategies to promote resiliency. Furthermore, the Government Accountability Office must report on the extent to which relevant federal grant programs address the prevalence and severity of mental health conditions and substance use disorders among health care providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Lorna Breen Health Care Provider Protection Act Dr. Lorna Breen Health Care Provider Protection Act

Sponsors

Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]
Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]
Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY]
Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]

Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 392 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-18HouseBecame Public Law No: 117-105. (TXT | PDF)
2022-03-18HouseSigned by President.
2022-03-11HousePresented to President.
2022-02-18SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2022-02-17SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
2022-02-17SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S800)
2021-12-09SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2021-12-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-12-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 36 (Roll no. 419). (text: CR H7522-7523)
2021-12-08HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7538-7539)
2021-12-08HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-12-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1667.
2021-12-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7522-7525)
2021-12-08HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-12-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154.
2021-12-08HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-213.
2021-11-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-11-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-11-04HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2021-11-04HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-03-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2021-03-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB610 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-71. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback