US SB610 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-10 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes grants and requires other activities to improve mental and behavioral health among health care providers. Specifically, the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must award grants to hospitals, medical professional associations, and other health care entities for programs to promote mental health and resiliency among health care providers. In addition, HHS may award grants for relevant mental and behavioral health training for health care students, residents, or professionals. Additionally, HHS must conduct a campaign to encourage health care providers to seek support and treatment for mental and behavioral health concerns and disseminate best practices to prevent suicide and improve mental health and resiliency among health care providers. HHS must also study and develop policy recommendations on improving mental and behavioral health among health care providers, removing barriers to accessing care and treatment, and identifying strategies to promote resiliency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Lorna Breen Health Care Provider Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-10HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-08-10HouseReceived in the House.
2021-08-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-08-06SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S5986-5987)
2021-08-06SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
2021-08-06SenateS.Amdt.2622 Amendment SA 2622 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2021-08-06SenateS.Amdt.2622 Amendment SA 2622 proposed by Senator Schatz for Senator Murray. (consideration: CR S5986; text: CR S5986) To improve the bill with respect to review of program effectiveness.
2021-08-06SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5985-5987; text: CR S5985-5986)
2021-06-08SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
2021-06-08SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Murray with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-05-25SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-03-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB1667 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback