US HB1652 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-15)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-15)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To deposit certain funds into the Crime Victims Fund, to waive matching requirements, and for other purposes.
Title
VOCA Fix to Sustain the Crime Victims Fund Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-20 - Senate - Passed Senate, under the order of 7/14/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment RC# 272 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-20 - Senate - Amendment SA 2121, as modified, S.Amdt.2121 RC# 271 (Y: 40 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 384 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-07-20 - Senate - Amendment SA 2121, as modified, S.Amdt.2121 RC# 271 (Y: 40 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 384 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-27. |
2021-07-22 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-07-21 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, under the order of 7/14/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 100 - 0. Record Vote Number: 272. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.2121 Amendment SA 2121 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S4962-4965, S4967-4974; text: CR S4962) To ensure adequate funding in the Crime Victims Fund is disbursed to victims, their families, and their advocates each year. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.2121 Amendment SA 2121, as modified, not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 60. Record Vote Number: 271. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4962-4965, S4967-4974) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2021-03-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-03-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 384 - 38 (Roll no. 89). (text: 3/16/2021 CR H1390-1391) |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1481-1482) |
2021-03-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-03-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1652. |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1390-1393) |
2021-03-16 | House | Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB611 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1122)