US HB1620 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Chesapeake Bay Program through FY2025.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Program Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2020-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H796) |
2020-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1620. |
2020-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H796-799) |
2020-02-05 | House | Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 269. |
2019-12-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-338. |
2019-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB701 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Chesapeake Bay
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
Watersheds
Chesapeake Bay
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Water quality
Watersheds