US HB1616 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-76. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-02 - Became Public Law No: 115-76. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening State and Local Cyber Crime Fighting Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize a National Computer Forensics Institute within the U.S. Secret Service for FY2017-FY2022. The institute shall: (1) disseminate information related to the investigation and prevention of cyber and electronic crime and related threats; and (2) educate, train, and equip state, local, tribal, and territorial law enforcement officers, prosecutors, and judges. Institute functions include: educating such officers, prosecutors, and judges on current cyber and electronic crimes and related threats, methods for investigating such crime and threats and for conducting computer and mobile device forensic examinations, and related prosecutorial and judicial challenges; training such officers to conduct investigations of such crime and related threats, as well as such forensic examinations, and to respond to network intrusion incidents; and training such officers, prosecutors, and judges on methods to obtain, process, store, and admit digital evidence in court. The institute: shall ensure that timely, actionable, and relevant expertise and information related to such crime and related threats is shared with such officers and prosecutors; may provide such officers with computer equipment, hardware, software, manuals, and tools necessary to conduct investigations of such crime and related threats and such forensic examinations; and shall facilitate the expansion of the network of Electronic Crime Task Forces of the Secret Service through the addition of officers trained at the institute. (Sec. 3) The bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to establish a new part, which may be cited as the National White Collar Crime Control Act of 2017, authorizing the Department of Justice's Bureau of Justice Assistance to enter into a cooperative agreement or make a grant for training and technical assistance to help law enforcement officers, investigators, auditors, and prosecutors identify, investigate, and prosecute white collar crime. White collar crime includes high-tech crime, economic crime, and Internet-based crime against children and child pornography.
Title
Strengthening State and Local Cyber Crime Fighting Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] |
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 258 (Y: 408 N: 3 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-02 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-76. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-12 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8012-8013) |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Mr. Ratcliffe asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8012-8013) |
2017-10-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2017-10-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.1109 Amendment SA 1109 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-10-02 | Senate | S.Amdt.1109 Amendment SA 1109 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S6264; text: CR S6264) In the nature of a substitute. |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6263-6264) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-05-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 3 (Roll no. 258). (text: CR H4206) |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4211-4212) |
2017-05-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1616. |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4205-4208) |
2017-05-16 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Protective Security. |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB904 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Homeland security
Judges
Law enforcement officers
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Homeland security
Judges
Law enforcement officers