US HB1604 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Map It Once, Use It Many Times Act - Establishes the National Geospatial Technology Administration in the Department of the Interior. Directs the Administrator of the National Geospatial Technology Administration to: (1) establish a National Geospatial Database of all U.S. owned or managed lands (including public lands), Indian trust parcels, and non-federal lands in each state; (2) provide a return on investment analysis and an economic benefit assessment of the Database; and (3) provide data to heads of federal agencies to determine if any U.S. owned or managed property could be better managed through ownership by a non-federal entity. Requires the Administrator to implement the recommendations of the National Geospatial Data Plan developed by the National Geospatial Policy Commission established by this Act. Requires the Administrator to promulgate standards for ensuring the interoperability of geospatial data collected by or with the support of the federal government. Transfers to the Administrator all geospatial functions vested by law in the Department of the Interior, the Department of Agriculture (USDA) with respect to the National Forest System, and the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA). Sets forth provisions for the acquisition of geospatial data, as specified, from public and commercial sources. Requires the Commission to identify in the Plan each geospatial activity performed by the federal government that: (1) is unnecessary and provide for its elimination, or (2) may be converted to performance by a private geospatial firm or a state or local government. Specifies, subject to stated exceptions, that all federal contracts for the performance of a geospatial activity include: (1) a condition that the activity be performed in the United States, and (2) a written certification that the funding will not be used for activities performed outside the United States. Directs the Administrator to develop: (1) a strategy for encouraging the use of private geospatial firms by federal agencies and other entities that receive federal funding, including foreign governments; (2) a Geospatial Research Plan to provide for U.S. investment in geospatial research and development activities; and (3) policy directives for the implementation of such activities.
Title
Map It Once, Use It Many Times Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2013-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
General public lands matters
Geography
Government information and archives
Hydrology and hydrography
Indian lands and resources rights
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
General public lands matters
Geography
Government information and archives
Hydrology and hydrography
Indian lands and resources rights
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1604/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1604/BILLS-113hr1604ih.pdf |